EP2075076 - Cleaning pig made of foam rubber for cleaning pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSIG GmbH Brunnenstrasse 75-77 73333 Gingen a. d. Fils / DE | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Oliver Brunnenstrasse 75-77 73333 Gingen a. d. Fils / DE | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Konle, Christian, et al Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Dr. Christian Konle Romanstrasse 33 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Konle, Christian, et al Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Dr. Christian Konle Wehrlestraße 13 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Konle, Christian, et al Rechtsanwalt Arnulfstrasse 27 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Konle, Christian, et al Rechtsanwalt Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Konle, Tilmar Benderstrasse 23 a 81247 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010605.7 | 11.06.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | DE20071063106 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007063106 | [2009/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075076 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2075076 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/055, F16L55/26, F16L55/40, F28G1/12 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
B08B9/0553 (EP);
F16L55/26 (EP);
F16L55/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmolch aus Schwammgummi zur Rohrreinigung | [2009/27] | English: | Cleaning pig made of foam rubber for cleaning pipes | [2009/27] | French: | Racleur de nettoyage en caoutchouc éponge pour le nettoyage de tuyaux | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | IT | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2342971 (HYPERLAST LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 9 * * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 16 * * claims 1-7 * [A] 7; | [X]DE102006035258 (SEMPERIT AG HOLDING [AT]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] - [0035] - [0047] - [0094] * * claims 1,10-12,15,16,22-27,31-34,37,41,44-46,53,60 * * figures 1-8 *; | [XA]US3474479 (GIRARD HARRY J) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 1-12; claims 1,2 * [A] 7; | [X]GB2339876 (SUTTIE WALTER ROBERT [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 16 * * claims 1,9 * * figures 5,7 *; | [XA]DE2136701 (GIRARD HARRY J) [X] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 22 * * page 6, line 4 - page 12, line 33 * * claims 1-5 * * figures 1-11 * [A] 7; | [X]EP0286320 (TDW DELAWARE INC [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 55 * * claims 1-4,8,9 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3015516 (STEINHOFF HORST W) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 12 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 11 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | GB2342971 | US3474479 | DE102006035258 | DE2136701 | EP0286320 | GB2339876 |