Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8149559 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2008316671 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007165138 | 22.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4306769B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2009 | B2 | JP2009005519 | 08.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007165138 | 22.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2017902 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B1 | EP2017902 | 11.02.2009 | A3 | EP2017902 | 21.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2007165138 | 22.06.2007 |