EP2017902 - Piezoelectric actuator driving device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2011/30] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakehi, Tatsuya c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Nagase, Noboru c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2011/04] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Kakehi, Tatsuya Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagase, Noboru Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010611.5 | 11.06.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | JP20070165138 | 22.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007165138 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017902 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017902 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017902 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/04 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
H02N2/067 (EP,US);
F02D41/2096 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/42] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Piezoelektrische Aktuatorantriebsvorrichtung und -verfahren | [2009/04] | English: | Piezoelectric actuator driving device and method | [2009/04] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de commande d'un actionneur piézoélectrique | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 09.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5387834 (SUZUKI MASASHI [JP]); | [XY]DE102005054680 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002136156 |