EP2003741 - A shielded sub-miniature connection assembly and process for equipping such a connection assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOURIAU 9, rue de la Porte de Buc 78000 Versailles / FR | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerard, Philippe 1 Villa Gascogne 94430 Chennevieres-Sur-Marne / FR | 02 /
Mallet, Philippe 3 Rue de Dijon 75012 Paris / FR | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010837.6 | 13.06.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | FR20070004271 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0704271 | FR20070004273 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0704273 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2003741 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003741 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H01R13/6275 (EP,US);
H01R13/6599 (EP,US);
H01R13/512 (EP,US);
H01R13/65918 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | Subminiatur abgeschirmte Verbinderanordnung und Verfahren zum Austatten einer solchen Verbinderandordnug. | [2008/51] | English: | A shielded sub-miniature connection assembly and process for equipping such a connection assembly | [2008/51] | French: | Assemblage de connecteur subminiature blindé et procédé pour équiper un tel assemblage de connecteur | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2008 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | IE | 13.06.2012 | LU | 13.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LU | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0090539 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * pages 1,2; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4600480 (COOMBES ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 3 * column 1, lines 11-18,46-55 * [Y] 8; | [XAY]US4715827 (FURMAN LEV B [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 5, lines 25-68 * * column 6, paragraphs 1-68 * * columns 8-9 * * column 13, lines 30-58; figures 1-11 * [A] 8 [Y] ; | [A]EP0421373 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 1-58; figures 1,2; claim - * [A] ; | [YA]EP0434431 (LORLIN ELECTRONICS PLC [GB]) [Y] 8 * column 11, lines 22-47; figures 1-4 * [A] 9,10; | [XAY]EP0684665 (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 3 * column 8, lines 11-55; figure 1 * [A] 9,10 [Y] 8; | [YA]EP1150391 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0026]; figures 1-4 * [A] 9,10; | [A]US2005054226 (AKAMA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 9,10* figures 1-11; claim - * | by applicant | US4715827 | EP0421373 | EP0684665 | EP1150391 |