EP2039823 - Laundry machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bae, Sang Hun c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | 02 /
Choi, Chul Jin c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Ju Han c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | 04 /
Lee, Tae Hee c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | [2014/04] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Bae, Sang Hun c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | ||
02 /
Choi, Chul Jin c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | |||
03 /
Yoon, Ju Han c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Tae Hee c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 671-711 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010906.9 | 16.06.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | KR20070096567 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: KR 20070096567 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039823 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039823 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039823 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/04, D06F39/00 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
D06F58/203 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/40 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/04 (KR);
D06F58/44 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/50 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/62 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/02 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/28 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/08] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsmaschine | [2009/13] | English: | Laundry machine | [2009/13] | French: | Machine de blanchisserie | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006129916 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-13* paragraph [0119]; figure 4 *; | [X]EP1813704 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0024]; figure 12 * | by applicant | WO2006129916 | EP1813704 |