EP2006609 - Warm water heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hube, Werner Hugo-Wolff-Weg 17 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Kreis, Oliver Dekaneigasse 8 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2008/52] | Application number, filing date | 08010939.0 | 17.06.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | DE20071028656 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007028656 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006609 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2006609 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10, F24D3/08 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
F24D19/1069 (EP,US);
F24D3/087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | F24D19/10 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2016/18] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Warmwasserbereiter | [2008/52] | English: | Warm water heater | [2008/52] | French: | Chauffe-eau | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE29609629U (SEEBACHER THEODOR [AT]) [I] 1-6 * page 6 - page 7; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0872788 (ELECTROWATT TECH INNOVAT CORP [CH]) [A] 6,7* the whole document *; | [A]WO0016011 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 3,4 * page 3 - page 4; figure 5 *; | [Y]DE10163984 (FROELING GMBH & CO KESSEL APPB [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]WO2006032680 (UNI BLOCK PRODUKTIONS UND VERT [AT], et al) [YD] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10032714 | WO2006032680 |