EP2006104 - Ink supply amount adjustment method and system for relief printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusaka, Akehiro c/o Komori Corporation Sekiyado Plant 210, Kirigasaku Noda-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Numauchi, Hiromitsu c/o Komori Corporation Tsukuba Plant 203-1 Nakayama Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010986.1 | 17.06.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | JP20070163378 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007163378 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006104 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2006104 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F31/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B41F31/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | B41F31/04, B41F31/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/47] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Regelung der Tintenzuführungsmenge für eine Reliefdruckpresse | [2008/52] | English: | Ink supply amount adjustment method and system for relief printing press | [2008/52] | French: | Procédé de réglage de la quantité d'encre fournie et système pour presse d'impression en relief | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2140353 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 30; figures 1-4; claims 1,12 *; | [A]US2969016 (FOTHERGILL CROSFIELD JOHN, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 29 - column 13, line 6; figures 1-15; claim 1 * |