EP1967141 - X-ray detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/37] | X-Ray computed tomography scanner and X-ray detecting system | ||
[2011/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimo-Ishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimo-Ishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugihara, Naoki 105-194, Mutsumi Nishinasuno-machi Nasu-Gun Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakayama, Michito 1959-45, Nakadawara Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Tatsuro 538-1 Kamitomatsuri-Cho Utsunomiya-Shi Tochigi-Ken / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
Sugihara, Naoki 105-194, Mutsumi Nishinasuno-machi Nasu-Gun Tochigi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Nakayama, Michito 1959-45, Nakadawara Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Tatsuro 538-1 Kamitomatsuri-Cho Utsunomiya-Shi Tochigi-Ken / JP | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/37] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2A 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08011114.9 | 26.11.2004 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967141 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967141 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G01T1/1644 (EP);
A61B6/032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/37] | Title | German: | Röntgen-Detektionssystem | [2011/14] | English: | X-ray detection system | [2011/14] | French: | Système de détection de rayonnement X | [2011/14] |
Former [2008/37] | Röntgen-Computertomographiescanner und Röntgenstrahlenerkennungssystem | ||
Former [2008/37] | X-Ray computed tomography scanner and X-ray detecting system | ||
Former [2008/37] | Scanner de tomographie assistée par ordinateur par rayons X et système de détection de rayons X | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04257342.8 / EP1661517 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040257342) is 06.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004065465 (CHAPPO MARC A [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 38 - page 3, paragraph 44 * * page 3, paragraph 46 - paragraph 48 * * page 4, paragraph 56 - paragraph 60 * * figures 1,2,3A,3B,4,5 *; | [A]US2002176535 (DIXON WALTER VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 2 * page 3, paragraph 86 * * page 4, paragraph 88 * * page 4, paragraph 95 - paragraph 97 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]EP1343024 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 20 * * figures 6,9,10,12 *; | [A]EP0788277 (STERLING DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 11 * * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | US2004065465 |