EP2015238 - Design-time rules mechanism for modeling systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP Portals Israel Ltd. 15 Ha'tidhar Street 43665 Ra'anana / IL | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilbora, Yuval Harambam St. 31 POB 909 Pardesiya 42815 Israel / IL | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011354.1 | 23.06.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US20070823173 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: US 823173 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015238 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0251 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Mechanismus für Designzeitregeln zur Systemmodellierung | [2009/03] | English: | Design-time rules mechanism for modeling systems | [2009/03] | French: | Mécanisme de règles de design-temps pour systèmes de modelage | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2016 | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/14] | 28.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 01.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003004746 (KHEIROLOMOOM ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] ** paragraphs [0032] - [0059] *; | [X]US2003069871 (YUCEL SERMET [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0014] * * paragraph [0075] *; | [X]WO03073343 (TOTAL SYSTEM SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - page 5, line 2 * * claims 1-23 *; | [X]US2005028133 (ANANTH VISWANATH [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0035] * | Examination | US5327529 |