EP2050392 - Lancet wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoenes, Joachim Rodauer Strasse 50a 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 02 /
List, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | 03 /
Zimmer, Volker Burgstrasse 17 67229 Laumersheim / DE | 04 /
Hoerauf, Christian In den Auwiesen 53 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 05 /
Krämer, Uwe Neue Schulstrasse 21 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-58 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [2012/36] |
Former [2009/17] | Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-58 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011411.9 | 24.06.2008 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | EP20070020148 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: EP 07020148 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050392 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050392 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61B5/151 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/15146 (EP,US);
A61B5/15153 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | Lanzettenrad | [2009/17] | English: | Lancet wheel | [2009/17] | French: | Roue à lancettes | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2008 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1190674 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-8 * paragraph [0062]; figures 1a,1b *; | [XY]EP1360934 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9-13 * figures 7a,7b,8a-8f * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0015] , [0036] , [0059] - [0063] - [0069] * [Y] 3,4,6-8; | [A]EP1402812 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 6* paragraph [0012]; figure 3 *; | [DA]EP1790288 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1,10-13 * page 21; figure 7 *; | [PX]EP1880671 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1,12 * paragraph [0038]; figure 3 * | Examination | US2005277850 | by applicant | EP1360934 | US2005277850 | WO2007060004 |