EP2011926 - Upper frame for excavator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment Holding Sweden AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jin Woo 406-606 Buyoung Green Town 7 cha, Jellmimaeul Sammun-ri, Jangyu-myeon, Kimhae-city / KR | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Schmidt, Sven Hendrik Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstraße 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011568.6 | 26.06.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | KR20070067106 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070067106 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011926 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/12, E02F9/08, E02F9/16 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
E02F9/10 (EP,US);
E02F9/08 (KR);
E02F9/00 (KR);
E02F9/0816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/37] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oberrahmen einer Aushubmaschine | [2009/02] | English: | Upper frame for excavator | [2009/02] | French: | Cadre supérieur pour excavateur | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005083040 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0049]; figures 3,5 *; | [X]JP2003213727 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP1754835 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 4,7 *; | [X]US2003110669 (WATANABE OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]JP2006274598 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,5,7 *; | [A]JP2005001480 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] * the whole document * |