EP2138995 - Fingering mechanism for woodwind instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reißner, Ernst Jakobsplatz 18 86152 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Reißner, Ernst Jakobplatz 18 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Reißner, Ernst Dillingerstrasse 20 86637 Wertingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Schinkel, Reta, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011714.6 | 27.06.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138995 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138995 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2138995 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10D7/06 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G10D9/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Griffmechanik für Holzblasinstrumente | [2010/01] | English: | Fingering mechanism for woodwind instruments | [2010/01] | French: | Mécanisme de clefs pour instruments de musique de la famille des bois | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/01] | Mécanisme de clefs pour instruments à vent en bois | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2008 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | IT | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | NO | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | ES | 01.01.2012 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR367347 (EUGENE ETIENNE LOUIS DEBONNE [FR]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]FR452348 (EVETTE ET SCHAEFFER SOC [FR]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2832249 (LEHMANN WALTER J) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1240588 (LÉON LBLANC [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]FR1429882 (BOOSEY & HAWKES LTD) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3890874 (VEDDER CHARLES N) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 34 *; | [X]FR2584222 (SELMER CIE HENRI [FR]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - LEON GOOSSENS, EDWIN ROXBURGH, Die Oboe, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, FISCHER, (1983), XP002501968 [A] 15 * pages 219-223 * |