EP2009578 - Finger vein authentication unit and information processing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiyomizu, Harumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Miura, Naoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Miyatake, Takafumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Nagasaka, Akio c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Sakurai, Souichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Takizawa, Hitoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Kiyomizu, Harumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Miura, Naoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Miyatake, Takafumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagasaka, Akio c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
05 /
Sakurai, Souichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
06 /
Takizawa, Hitoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 12F, Marunouchi Center Bldg., 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/01] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011730.2 | 27.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | JP20070169873 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007169873 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009578 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009578 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009578 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, A61B5/117, G06K9/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06V40/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2014/12] |
Former [2014/01] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fingervenen-Authentifizierungseinheit und Informationsverarbeitungseinheit | [2009/01] | English: | Finger vein authentication unit and information processing unit | [2009/01] | French: | Unité d'authentification des veines du doigt et unité de traitement d'informations | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) TR | 17.02.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s) TR | 12.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0039744 (POEHS HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]EP1308876 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 13, line 12 - column 14, line 30; figures 17,18 *; | [I]US6668071 (MINKIN VIKTOR ALBERTOVICH [RU], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005254690 (NAGASAKA AKIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *; | [I]WO2006134669 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2007024018 (HITACHI INF & CONTROL SYST [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2007037471 (HITACHI INF & CONTROL SYST [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IP]EP1929947 (HITACHI INF & CONTROL SYST [JP]) [IP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2372608 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0249] - paragraph [0284]; figures 14-15 * | by applicant | JP2006155575 |