EP2050421 - Apparatus for preventing sleeping respiratory obstruction and method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 21.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio Sleep Med Co., Ltd. of 1st Fl. Riberta 11-5 Anam-dong 5-ga Seongbuk-gu Seoul / KR | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Junghwa Gwanak Buyeoung Apt. 201-1502 Buheung-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shin, Chol 58-303 Jugong-1danji 782 Banpo-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011806.0 | 30.06.2008 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | KR20070103357 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070103357 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050421 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A61F5/56 (EP,KR,US);
A47G9/1045 (KR);
A61B5/093 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/01] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Prävention von Atmungshemmung im Schlaf und Anwendungsverfahren dafür | [2009/17] | English: | Apparatus for preventing sleeping respiratory obstruction and method using the same | [2009/17] | French: | Appareil de prévention d'obstruction respiratoire du sommeil et son procédé d'utilisation | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 23.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/47] | 19.10.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2012 | 01.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0658935U ([JP]) [Y] 2 * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE19535232 (PAULUS MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,4-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 21-67 * * column 3, lines 24-39 * [Y] 2-5,7,8; | [Y]JP2005058387 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 3-5,7,8 * figures 1,2,9,10 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0036] - [0040] *; | [Y]JP2005261682 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 3-5,7,8 * figures 1,4 ** paragraphs [0034] - [0037] * | Examination | US2004139549 | EP1655051 | by applicant | JPH0658935U | DE19535232 | JP2005058387 | JP2005261682 |