EP1985892 - Belt type continuously variable transmission, power unit having the belt type continuously variable transmission, vehicle carrying belt type continuously variable transmission, and sheave for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai, Iwata-shi SHIZUOKA-KEN 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Yousuke 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012148.6 | 04.03.2005 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | JP20040077826 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004077826 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985892 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985892 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985892 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H9/18 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
F16H63/067 (EP,US);
F16G5/166 (EP,US);
F16H55/563 (EP,US);
F16H9/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Stufenloser Riemenantrieb, Triebwerk mit dem stufenlosen Riemenantrieb, Fahrzeug mit dem stufenlosen Riemenantrieb und für Rolle für stufenloses Getriebesystem | [2008/44] | English: | Belt type continuously variable transmission, power unit having the belt type continuously variable transmission, vehicle carrying belt type continuously variable transmission, and sheave for continuously variable transmission | [2008/44] | French: | Transmission variable continue de type courroie, unité d'alimentation disposant de la transmission variable continue de type courroie, transmission variable continue de type de courroie de véhicule, et poulie pour transmission variable continue | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 03.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05719999.4 / EP1752685 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | BE | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IT | 16.12.2009 | LT | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | PL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | IE | 04.03.2010 | LU | 04.03.2010 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | IS | 16.04.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2010 | ||
LU | 04.03.2010 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2010 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2010 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4102214 (HOFF STEPHEN J) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]JPH0861448 (KITAKO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002147553 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2001248698 |