EP2141176 - New bacteriophage adhesion proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomérieux S.A. Chemin de l'Orme 69280 Marcy L'Etoile / FR | [2010/10] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Profos AG Josef-Engert-Strasse 11 93053 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biebl, Manfred Regerstrasse 10 93053 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Grassl, Renate Schelmengraben 4e 93053 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
Walter, Monika Graf Zeppelinstrasse 16 93053 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Miller, Stefan Roggenweg 11 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Biebl, Manfred Regerstrasse 10 93053 Regensburg / DE | ||
02 /
Grassl, Renate Schelmengraben 4e 93053 Regensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Walter, Monika Graf Zeppelinstrasse 16 93053 Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012152.8 | 04.07.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141176 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141176 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/005, C12N9/24, G01N33/569 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,CN,US);
C12N1/20 (CN);
G01N33/56911 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/22 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Neue bakteriophage Haftproteine | [2010/01] | English: | New bacteriophage adhesion proteins | [2010/01] | French: | Nouvelles protéines d'adhésion de bactériophages | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/01] | Nouvelles protéines d'adhésion bactériophages | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2008 | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | HR | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | NO | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/51] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO0109370 (PROFOS GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, line 1; claims 1,4,6,7 *; | [A]US2004121403 (MILLER STEFAN [DE]) [A] * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2004197833 (LOESSNER MARTIN [CH]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US2004248298 (SCHUTZ MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0053] , [0054] *; | [E]WO2008121830 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [E] 1-4,6-15 *Section. 1.7.4* * page 7, line 3; page 9 lines 26-33; page 10 line 1-2; page 10 line 28; page 12 line 5 *; | [X] - BAXA U ET AL, "INTERACTIONS OF PHAGE P22 TAILS WITH THEIR CELLULAR RECEPTOR, SALMONELLA O-ANTIGEN POLYSACCHARIDE", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, NEW YORK, US, US, (19961001), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 2040 - 2048, XP000613194 [X] 1-4,6-8,15 * page 2043, column 2, paragraph 2 * | Examination | - DANNER ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 215, pages 653 - 661 | by applicant | EP1198713 | EP1356080 | EP1399551 | - STENUTZ ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 30, pages 382 - 403 | - SCHWARZ; BERGET, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 20112 - 20119 | - SCHWARZ; BERGET, GENETICS, (1989), vol. 121, pages 635 - 649 | - GEORGE; HERINGA, PROTEIN ENG, (2003), vol. 15, pages 871 - 879 | - BAE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, pages 2264 - 2270 | - DANNER ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 215, pages 653 - 661 | - BAXA ET AL., BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 71, pages 2040 - 2048 | - SECKLER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 11750 - 11763 | - RUSSIAN CHEMICAL REV., (1964), vol. 33, pages 92 - 103 | - ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 185, pages 131 - 135 | - RUSSINA CHEMICAL REV., (1964), vol. 33, pages 92 - 103 | - HITCHCOCK; BROWN, J. BACTERIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 154, pages 269 - 277 | - SAMUEL ET AL., J. BACTERIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 186, pages 6536 - 6543 |