EP2026456 - Inverter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMA Solar Technology AG Sonnenallee 1 34266 Niestetal / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zacharias, Peter, Prof. Dr. Heinrich-Albert-Strasse 3 34131 Kassel / DE | 02 /
Friebe, Jens Johann-Wolf-Strasse 27 37176 Nörten-Harenberg / DE | 03 /
Blumenstein, Felix Im Roten Land 6 37235 Hessisch Lichtenau / DE | 04 /
Gerlach, Ann-Katrin Hufelandweg 3 34131 Kassel / DE | 05 /
Scheuermann, Jan Hardtweg 26 34305 Niedenstein / DE | 06 /
Zinn, Matthias Die Tränke 8 34632 Jesberg / DE | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Zacharias, Peter, Prof. Dr. Heinrich-Albert-Strasse 3 34131 Kassel / DE | ||
02 /
Friebe, Jens Johann-Wolf-Strasse 27 37176 Nörten-Harenberg / DE | |||
03 /
Blumenstein, Felix Im Roten Land 6 37235 Hessisch Lichtenau / DE | Representative(s) | Walther Bayer Faber Patentanwälte PartGmbB Heimradstraße 2 34130 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012566.9 | 11.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20071038960 | 14.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007038960 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026456 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2026456 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M3/156 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H02M7/521 (KR);
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
H02M7/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Wechselrichter | [2009/08] | English: | Inverter | [2009/08] | French: | Onduleur | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE102004037446 (CONERGY AG [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * figures 2,4 *; | [DA]DE10225020 (SMA REGELSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figures 1,5a,5b *; | [DA]US2007047277 (KONISHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 7 * | [X] - POH CHIANG LOH ET AL, "Z-Source B4 Inverters", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2007. PESC 2007. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070617), ISBN 978-1-4244-0654-8, pages 1363 - 1369, XP031218483 [X] 1-7 * figure 11(a) * * page 1366, paragraph IV - page 1367, column L * | [A] - YI HUANG ET AL, "Source Inverter for Residential Photovoltaic Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20061101), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 1776 - 1782, XP011142834 [A] 1-7 * figures 2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2006.882913 | [A] - TUCKEY A M ET AL, "A low-cost inverter for domestic fuel cell applications", 33RD.ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. PESC 2002. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CAIRNS, QUEENSLAND, AUSTRALIA, JUNE 23 - 27, 2002; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020623), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7262-7, pages 339 - 346, XP010596110 [A] 1 * figure 13 * | [A] - PENG F Z ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Z-source inverter", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2002 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. 37TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING . PITTSBURGH, PA, OCT. 13 - 18, 2002; [CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. IAS ANNUAL MEETING], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021013), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7420-1, pages 775 - 781, XP010609970 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2002.1042647 | by applicant | DE102004037446 | DE10221592 | DE102004030912 | DE10225020 | DE19642522 | DE19732218 | US2007047277 |