EP2028059 - Motor vehicle with a display of additional consumption caused by switching on operational systems or mounted components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/09] | Motor vehicle with a display of additional consumption caused by connecting operational systems or mounted components | ||
[2010/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgert, Sascha Kastanienallee 2 85088 Vohburg / DE | 02 /
Apel, Frank Manfred-Hochstatter-Str. 3 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 03 /
Ecard, Karl Bernhard Gneisenaustrasse 58 89077 Ulm / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG, Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012740.0 | 15.07.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20072011919U | 24.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011919 U | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028059 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2028059 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028059 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F16H63/42 (EP);
B60R16/0236 (EP);
Y02T10/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/32] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Anzeige des durch zugeschaltete Betriebssysteme oder montierte Anbauteile verursachten Mehrverbrauchs | [2009/09] | English: | Motor vehicle with a display of additional consumption caused by switching on operational systems or mounted components | [2010/51] | French: | Véhicule automobile doté d'un affichage de la consommation multiple par des systèmes de fonctionnement mis sous tension ou des pièces rapportées montées | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/09] | Motor vehicle with a display of additional consumption caused by connecting operational systems or mounted components | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 03.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10138750 (CAA AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003144779 (OBAYASHI KAZUYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0016] , [0019] , [0043] , [0047] - [0049] - [0054] , [0056] , [0077] , [0080] , [0089] - [0091] *; | [X]EP0601300 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 1-7,10-16 * |