EP2023342 - Noise reduction with integrated tonal noise reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QNX Software Systems (Wavemakers), Inc. 302-134 Abott Street Vancouver BC V6B 2K4 / CA | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hetherington, Phillip A. 23 Fernway Drive Port Moody, BC V3H 5H7 / CA | 02 /
Li, Xueman 4223 Pandora Street Burnaby, BC V5C2B4 / CA | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012861.4 | 16.07.2008 | [2009/07] | Priority number, date | US20070951922P | 25.07.2007 Original published format: US 951922 P | US20070961715 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: US 961715 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023342 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G10L21/0232 (EP);
G10L21/0208 (KR);
G10L21/02 (US);
G10L15/20 (KR);
G10L21/0216 (KR);
G10L2021/02085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | 16.07.2008 | BA | 16.07.2008 | MK | 16.07.2008 | RS | 16.07.2008 | Title | German: | Geräuschunterdrückung mit integrierter Unterdrückung tonaler Geräusche | [2009/07] | English: | Noise reduction with integrated tonal noise reduction | [2009/07] | French: | Réduction de bruit avec une réduction des bruits sonores intégrée | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 12.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5706395 (ARSLAN LEVENT M [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * abstract ** column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 62 *; | [A]EP1703494 (EMMA MIXED SIGNAL CV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO2006122388 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 25 * | by applicant | - EPHRAIM, Y.; MALAH, D., "Speech Enhancement Using A Minimum-Mean Square Error Short-Time Spectral Amplitude Estimator", IEEE TRANS. ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (198412), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 1109 - 1121 |