Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
11.09.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.09.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
09.01.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
09.01.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
24.07.2008 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state |