Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8489396 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2013 | B2 | US2008167870 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95192207 | 25.07.2007 | US96171507 | 20.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090012154 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US95192207 | 25.07.2007 | US96171507 | 20.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009031793 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US95192207 | 25.07.2007 | US96171507 | 20.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2023342 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95192207 | 25.07.2007 | US96171507 | 20.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2638265 | 18.06.2013 | C | CA2638265 | 25.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95192207 | 25.07.2007 | US96171507 | 20.12.2007 |