EP2017561 - Heat accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brecht, Wido E. 32 Rue de Jardin 67660 Betschdorf / FR | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/04] | Mierswa, Klaus Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012928.1 | 17.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | DE20071033734 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007033734 | [2009/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017561 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/00 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
F28D20/0056 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmespeicher | [2009/04] | English: | Heat accumulator | [2009/04] | French: | Accumulateur thermique | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | AT327339B |