Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8103332 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2012 | B2 | US2009054789 | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007214919 | 21.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4948326B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2012 | B2 | JP2009045281 | 05.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007214919 | 21.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2027813 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2014 | B1 | EP2027813 | 25.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007214919 | 21.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101371780B | 15.12.2010 | B | CN101371780 | 25.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007214919 | 21.08.2007 |