EP2025428 - Unit for the production of safety cages for corks of bottles for effervescent beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brevetti e Tecnologia S.r.l. Sestiere Cannaregio, 5557 30131 Venezia (VE) / IT | [2009/51] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states ME COM S.r.l. Via Biella 30/B 13885 Salussola BI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mestrinaro, Luca Via Provinciale, 20 13886 Viverone (BI) / IT | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio Corso Vittorio Emanuele II 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2009/08] | Application number, filing date | 08013137.8 | 22.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | IT2007TO00550 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: IT TO20070550 | [2009/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025428 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025428 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21F45/04 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B21F45/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Einheit für die Herstellung von Sicherheitskäfigen für Flaschenkorken von schäumenden Getränken | [2009/08] | English: | Unit for the production of safety cages for corks of bottles for effervescent beverages | [2009/08] | French: | Unité pour la production de cages de sécurité pour les bouchons de bouteilles de boissons effervescentes | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HR | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | PT | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | NO | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]IT1072710 (ICAS S A S DI GIOVANNI POMA & [IT]) [A] 1* page 10; figures 4-7 *; | [DA]DE4412203 (GEFIN SRL [IT]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1634664 (GEFIN SRL [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | IT1264109 |