EP2019176 - Fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEW Kunststofferzeugnisse GmbH Wilthen Dresdner Strasse 19 02681 Wilthen / DE | [2015/38] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states KEW Kunststofferzeugnisse GmbH Wilthen Dresdner Strasse 19 02681 Wilthen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gedan, Eberhard Hauptstrasse 124a 02689 Sohland / DE | 02 /
Mager, Heiko Alte Strasse 5 01904 Neukirch / DE | 03 /
Steglich, Maik Kleinseite 8 02681 Schirgiswalde / DE | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Sperling, Thomas Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Tolkewitzer Straße 22 01277 Dresden / DE | [2015/38] |
Former [2012/26] | Sperling, Thomas Sperling, Fischer & Heyner Patentanwälte Niederwaldstraße 27 01277 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Klaiber, Kilian Hörwarthstraße 6 80804 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | Koal, Rosemarie Anne-Frank-Weg 12 01640 Coswig / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013217.8 | 23.07.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | DE20072010563U | 27.07.2007 Original published format: DE 202007010563 U | [2009/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019176 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019176 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019176 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/36, E04F13/08, F16B13/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
E04F13/0835 (EP);
E04B1/7633 (EP);
E04D3/3603 (EP);
F16B13/00 (EP);
F16B43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungselement | [2009/05] | English: | Fastening element | [2009/05] | French: | Elément de fixation | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 05.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2011 | 31.07.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2008 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2201368 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [X] 1-3,7-8,10-11 * page 18, line 11 - page 19, line 22; figures 10-12 * [Y] 4-6,9,12-16; | [Y]DE20019566U (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 9; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE20021397U (KEW KUNSTSTOFFERZEUGNISSE WILT [DE]) [Y] 9,12-16 * page 5 - page 6; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE10361751 | DE19619318 | DE20021397U | EP0723053 | DE19957820 | DE20019566U | DE10012201 |