EP2025532 - Presentation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | 08.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMONTA Konferenz- und Medien-Raumausstattung GmbH Eiserntalstrasse 185 57080 Siegen-Eiserfeld / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Markus Sinnerbach 6d 57080 Siegen / DE | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Nies, Marc Forststrasse 31 a 57074 Siegen / DE | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013389.5 | 25.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20072010920U | 04.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007010920 U | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025532 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025532 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B43L1/04, B43L1/06, A47B97/00, A47B97/06, G09F19/00, G03B21/54 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
B43L1/045 (EP);
B43L1/06 (EP);
G03B21/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | B43L1/04, B43L1/06, A47B97/00, A47B97/06, G09F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Präsentationssystem | [2009/08] | English: | Presentation system | [2009/08] | French: | Système de présentation | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1099707 (HOHENLOHER SCHULMOEBEL UND TUR) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO02089474 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 29; figures 3-6 *; | [A]WO2004062278 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006116505 (BRETFORD MFG INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1099707 | WO02089474 |