EP2151699 - A pulse radar ranging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Milltronics Process Instruments Inc. 1954 Technology Drive Peterborough, ON K9J 7B1 / CA | [2011/11] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Siemens Milltronics Process Instruments Inc. 1954 Technology Drive ON K9J 7B1 Peterborough / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burcea, George 23 Morland Crescent Ajax L1T 4P6 Ontario / CA | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013545.2 | 28.07.2008 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151699 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151699 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/40, G01S13/10, G01F23/284 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01S13/103 (EP,US);
G01S7/4021 (EP,US);
G01S7/4065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/41] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pulsradarabstandsmessungssystem | [2010/06] | English: | A pulse radar ranging system | [2010/06] | French: | Système de télémétrie par radar à impulsions | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 11.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1770409 (SIEMENS MILLTRONICS PROC INSTR [CA]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4240491 (VEGA GRIESHABER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]US4521778 (KNEPPER UDO [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4521778 | US4132991 | US2008036649 |