EP2202523 - Diagnosis assisting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linssen, Jo c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | 02 /
Guhl, Matthias c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2016/27] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Linssen, Jo c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
Guhl, Matthias c/o Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/27] |
Former [2010/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013606.2 | 29.07.2008 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | JP20070199826 | 31.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007199826 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202523 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2202523 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G06K9/62, // G01N15/14 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
G01N15/12 (EP,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
G01N35/00722 (US);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G01N2015/1006 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00881 (EP,US);
G01N2035/009 (EP,US);
G01N35/00594 (EP,US);
G01N35/00871 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | G01N35/00, // G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Diagnoseassistenzsystem | [2010/26] | English: | Diagnosis assisting system | [2010/26] | French: | Système d'aide au diagnostic | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2015 | 19.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2008 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | IE | 29.07.2016 | LU | 29.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004265874 (BINDER STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0021] , [0025] - [0029] - [0033] , [0036]; claims 1,6 *; | [A]US2005219527 (IKEUCHI YOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,15,16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] , [0035] *; | [A]US6576471 (OTVOS JAMES D [US]) [A] 1,15,16 * column 2, lines 15-37 * | Examination | US6077665 | US2006004530 | by applicant | JPH11326315 | JPH0757018 | US2004265874 | US6077664 | - MOAKE JL, "Thrombotic microangiopathies", N ENGL J MED, (2003), vol. 347, pages 589 - 600 | - MOAKE JL, "Von Willebrand factor, ADAMTS-13, and thromboticthrombocytopenic purpura", SEMIN HEMATOL, (2004), vol. 41, pages 4 - 14 | - INGRAM, M.; COOPERSMITH, A., "Reticulated Platelts following Acute Blood Loss", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (1969), vol. 17, pages 225 - 229 | - KIENAST, J.; SCHMITZ, G., "Flow cytometric analysis of thiazole orange uptake by platelets: a diagnostic aid in the evaluation of thrombocytopenicdisorders", BLOOD, (1990), vol. 75, pages 116 - 121 | - WATANABE-K; TAKEUCHI, K.; KAWAI, Y.; IKEDA, Y.; KUBOTA, F.; NAKAMOTO, H, "Automated measurement of reticulated platelets in estimating thrombopoiesis", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 54, pages 163 - 171 | - BRIGGS C; KUNKA S; HART D; OGUNI S; MACHIN S, "Assessment of an immature platelet fraction (IPF) in peripheral thrombocytopenia", BRIT J HAEMATOL, (2004), vol. 126, page 93 | - BRIGGS C; HART D; KUNKA S; OGUNI S; MACHIN S, "Immature platelet fraction measurement: a future guide ti platelet transfusion requirement after haematopoietic stem cell transplantation", TRANSFUSION MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 16, page 101 | - KICKLER T; OGUNI S; BOROWITZ M, "A clinical evaluationof high fluorescent platelet fraction percentage in thrombocytopenia", AM J CLIN PATHOL, (2006), vol. 125, page 282 | - NORFOLK, DR; ANCLIFFE, PJ; CONTRERAS, M; HUNT, BJ; MACHIN, SJ; MURPHY, WG; WILLIAMSON, LM, "Consensus Conference on Platelet Transfusion, Royal College of Physicians of Edinburgh 27-28 November", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (1997), vol. 101, pages 609 - 617 | - ANCLIFF, P.J.; MACHIN, S.J., "Trigger factors for the prophylactic platelet transfusion", BLOOD REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 12, pages 234 - 238 | - S. IMOTO, "Fragments", LABHEMATOL., (2005), vol. 11, pages 131 - 136 |