EP2149351 - Endoprosthesis component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waldemar Link GmbH & Co. KG Barkhausenweg 10 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states DERU GmbH Oststrasse 26 22844 Norderstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Helmut D. Wildstieg 14 22397 Hamburg / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/05] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013612.0 | 29.07.2008 | [2010/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149351 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149351 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/44 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61F2/3094 (EP);
A61F2/4425 (EP);
A61F2002/30843 (EP);
A61F2002/30845 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/30884 (EP);
A61F2002/30892 (EP);
A61F2002/3092 (EP);
A61F2002/3093 (EP);
A61F2310/00179 (EP);
A61F2310/00203 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Endoprothesenkomponente | [2010/05] | English: | Endoprosthesis component | [2010/05] | French: | Composants d'endoprothèses | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2008 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MT | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | AT | 29.07.2017 | LU | 29.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 16.11.2016 | |
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 16.11.2016 | |
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0185068 (UNIV HEIDELBERG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4 * * page 6, lines 2-4 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 10, column 2 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 14, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - * [A] 5; | [X]DE19755536 (CERAMTEC AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 42; figure -; claim - *; | [DX]WO9930634 (CERAMTEC AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,5; | [A]DD298737 (UNIV CHEMNITZ TECH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure -; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [A]EP0803234 (BIOMET LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1440669 (DINKELACKER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0010] - [0028]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2001036530 (NODA IWAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0026] - [0061]; figure -; claim - * | Examination | EP0278205 | by applicant | WO9930634 |