blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2020460

EP2020460 - Transition device from a concrete protective wall to a steel safety barrier on streets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2014
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eurovia Beton GmbH
Caputher Chaussee 1a
14552 Michendorf / DE
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Heinrich, Wolfgang
Am Kirschberg 10
09603 Grossschirma / DE
02 / Qualmann, Christian
Lindenstrasse 37a
14548 Schwielowsee / DE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/03]Von Rohr
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
Former [2009/06]Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date08013720.131.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE20072010798U01.08.2007         Original published format: DE 202007010798 U
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020460
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020460
Date:23.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020460
Date:29.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2013
ClassificationIPC:E01F15/04, E01F15/14, E01F15/08
[2013/04]
CPC:
E01F15/0407 (EP); E01F15/083 (EP)
Former IPC [2009/06]E01F15/04, E01F15/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Übergangsvorrichtung von einer Betonschutzwand auf eine Stahlschutzplanke an Strassen[2009/06]
English:Transition device from a concrete protective wall to a steel safety barrier on streets[2009/06]
French:Dispositif de transition d'un mur de protection en béton à une barrière de sécurité en acier sur routes[2009/06]
Examination procedure15.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/13]
21.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2013Fee for grant paid
17.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2013
Opposition(s)30.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.07.2008
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU31.07.2008
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2016/29]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2016/25]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2015/51]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.07.2014
IE31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2015/13]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
LU31.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE202005008391U  (SPS SCHUTZPLANKEN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE8914143U  (SPS SCHUTZPLANKEN GMBH, 63743 ASCHAFFENBURG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 25 * * figures 1,2,3,6 *;
 [A]DE202006017431U  (SPS SCHUTZPLANKEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraphs [0048] , [0054] * * figures 1,4b,11 *
by applicantDE3742356
 DE202005008391U
 DE202005002859U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.