EP2020569 - Headlamp system with controlled and/or regulated defogging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states odelo GmbH Alfred-Schefenacker-Strasse 1 71409 Schwaikheim / DE | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthel, Frank Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 360 75172 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
Tebbe, Frank Gerstenweg 12 73733 Esslingen / DE | 03 /
Leitretter, Andreas Berkheimer Strasse 12 73770 Denkendorf / DE | 04 /
Apfelbeck, Robert Bachstrasse 12 94447 Platting / DE | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine Kaufmann & Stumpf Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Alte Weinsteige 71 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine Kaufmann & Stumpf Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Alte Weinsteige 71 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/06] | Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine Kaufmann & Stumpf Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Alte Weinsteige 71 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013734.2 | 31.07.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | DE20071036486 | 01.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007036486 | [2009/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020569 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2020569 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020569 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21V31/03, F21S8/10, // F21W101/10, F21Y101/02 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
F21S45/33 (EP);
F21S45/435 (EP,US);
F21S45/60 (EP);
F21V29/67 (EP,US);
F21V29/83 (EP);
F21V29/90 (EP,US);
F21V31/03 (EP);
F21S41/143 (EP,US);
F21S41/151 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SI [2010/46] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Scheinwerfersystem mit gesteuerter und/oder geregelter Beschlagverminderungsvorrichtung | [2009/06] | English: | Headlamp system with controlled and/or regulated defogging system | [2009/06] | French: | Système de phare doté d'un dispositif de désembuage commandé et/ou réglé | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 10.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SK, TR | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2701756 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1-2,5-9 * page 1, column 7; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-4; | [Y]DE102005027087 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 3-4 * page 1 - page 4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102005060736 (SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 7; figures 1-7 *; | [AP]US2008047943 (BURTON THOMAS R [US]) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005019651 |