EP2028310 - Sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÜRKOPP ADLER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Potsdamer Strasse 190 33719 Bielefeld / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichenbecher, Ingolf Hochstrasse 1 63768 Hösbach-Rottenberg / DE | 02 /
Fäth, Jochen Gemeindefeld 14 63808 Haibach / DE | 03 /
Roth, Erwin Eichendorffstrasse 11 63814 Mainaschaff / DE | 04 /
Hartmann, Edgar Steinbacher Strasse 41 63867 Johannesberg / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014257.3 | 09.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20072011790U | 23.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011790 U | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028310 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2028310 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D05B3/12, D05B35/02, D05B3/04 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
D05B19/16 (KR);
D05B3/04 (EP);
D05B3/12 (EP);
D05B33/00 (KR);
D05B35/00 (KR);
D05B35/02 (EP);
D05D2303/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | D05B3/12, D05B35/02 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/26] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nähautomat | [2009/09] | English: | Sewing machine | [2009/09] | French: | Machine à coudre | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE102007039866 (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-12 *; | [XA]CH383134 (BATA SCHUHE AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 54 - page 3, line 63; figures 1-6 * [A] 3-12; | [XA]DE1485281 (PFAFF AG G M) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-2 * [A] 3-12; | [A]US2142476 (MCDONALD JOHN I) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 18 - line 57; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3434370 (SCHOLL HANS, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-13 *; | [A]DE7138113U (KOCHS ADLER AG) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-7 * |