EP1995270 - PTFE powder and method of producing PTFE molding powders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg., 4-12, Nakazaka-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuji, Masayuki DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
Asano, Michio DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
Sukegawa, Masamichi DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2018/23] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Tsuji, Masayuki DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Asano, Michio DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Sukegawa, Masamichi DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant., 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/23] |
Former [2008/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014427.2 | 24.10.2002 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010327017 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001327017 | JP20010327018 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001327018 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995270 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995270 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1995270 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C08J3/122 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
C08J2327/18 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/18, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | PTFE-Pulver und Herstellungsverfahren für PTFE-Formpulver | [2008/48] | English: | PTFE powder and method of producing PTFE molding powders | [2008/48] | French: | Poudre PTFE et procédé de production de poudres de moulage PTFE | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 02.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02777940.4 / EP1449866 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020777940) is 28.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | GB | 24.10.2018 | IE | 24.10.2018 | LU | 24.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
GB | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
GB | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
GB | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
GB | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4241137 (IZUMO MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11* claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0794213 (MITSUI DU PONT FLUORCHEMICAL [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-11 * page 3, lines 6-11; claim - * | by applicant | JPH03259925 | JPH05180694 | WO9316126 | WO9628498 | WO9841569 | JPH10259252 | JPH10316763 | JP2000165035 | JP2000319668 |