EP2055541 - Driver assistance system with control of parking brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | 22.04.2016 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | 22.04.2016 | Change - inventor | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bensch, Uwe Gretchenstrasse 11 30161 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Breuer, Karsten Lenzhalde 1 88179 Oberreute / DE | 03 /
Rosendahl, Hartmut Edwin-Oppler-Weg 9 30167 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Strache, Wolfgang Wundramstrasse 4 30966 Hemmingen / DE | 05 /
Struwe, Otmar Göbelstrasse 13 30163 Hannover / DE | [2016/21] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Bensch, Uwe Gretchenstrasse 11 30161 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
Breuer, Karsten, Dr. Milanweg 20 31867 Lauenau / DE | |||
03 /
Rosendahl, Hartmut Edwin-Oppler-Weg 9 30167 Hannover / DE | |||
04 /
Strache, Wolfgang, Dr. Wundramstrasse 4 30966 Hemmingen / DE | |||
05 /
Struwe, Otmar Göbelstrasse 13 30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014568.3 | 16.08.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | DE20071052439 | 02.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007052439 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055541 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055541 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, B60T8/88, B60T15/04, B60T7/22, B60T13/38, B60T13/68, B60T17/08, B60T17/22 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B60T7/22 (EP);
B60T13/385 (EP);
B60T13/68 (EP);
B60T15/041 (EP);
B60T17/085 (EP);
B60T17/221 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | B60T7/22, B60T13/38, B60T13/68, B60T17/08, B60T17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Fahrerassistenzsystem mit Steuerung der Feststellbremse | [2009/19] | English: | Driver assistance system with control of parking brake | [2009/19] | French: | Système d'assistance du conducteur avec commande de frein de stationnement | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2008 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | AT | 16.08.2013 | GB | 16.08.2013 | IE | 16.08.2013 | LU | 16.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
AT | 16.08.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
AT | 16.08.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 13.03.2013 | |
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 13.03.2013 | |
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1504975 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * page 9, line 31 - page 11, line 7; figure 2 * [Y] 3,5; | [X]EP1571061 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 12, line 21 - column 14, line 43; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2003006644 (MACGREGOR G DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 3 * page 3, paragraph 36 - page 4, paragraph 43 *; | [Y]DE19942533 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 2 - column 3, line 19; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE102005016001 |