Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
25.09.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.09.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
23.01.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |