EP2028435 - Armour for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH An der Talle 27-31 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knaup, Hans-Jürgen Adolf-Kolpingstrasse 194 33175 Bad Lippspringe / DE | 02 /
Müller, Markus Dr.-Mertens-Weg 38a 33102 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
Klasfauseweh, Udo Josef-Stork-Strasse 7 3334 Gütersloh / DE | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 08014569.1 | 16.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20071039998 | 23.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007039998 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028435 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F41H7/04 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F41H7/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/44] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Panzerung für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/09] | English: | Armour for a vehicle | [2009/09] | French: | Blindage pour un véhicule | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1754949 (MOWAG GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * [Y] 5,9; | [YD]DE10246164 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [YD] 5,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]US4412122 (BOEHM GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8 * abstract *; | [X]DE19933380 (SACHSENRING ENTWICKLUNGSGMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,8 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 30 - line 48 *; | [A]FR864789 (ANCIENS ETS HOTCHKISS & CIE) [A] * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 20 * * page 2, line 43 - line 48 *; | [A]RU2095729 (K B TRANSPORTNOGO MASH [SU]) [A] * figures 5,6 * | by applicant | EP1052296 | DE2452486 | DE102005014298 | DE102004006093 | DE10246164 | DE10049660 | DE102004054795 | DE69707066T |