EP1987942 - A sheet obtained by extruding and molding a raw material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirata, Hajime c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 5208558 / JP | 02 /
Uehara, Masatsugu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 5208558 / JP | 03 /
Nakai, Yasuhiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 5208558 / JP | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014707.7 | 17.09.2001 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | JP20000286881 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000286881 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1987942 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1987942 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/16, B29C47/92, G05B13/04 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
B29C55/12 (EP,US);
B29D7/01 (KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/269 (EP,US);
B29C48/313 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,KR,US);
G05B13/042 (EP,US);
G05B13/048 (EP,US);
B29C2037/90 (EP,US);
B29C2793/009 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92066 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92076 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92152 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92314 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92438 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92542 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92571 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9258 (EP,US);
B29C2948/926 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92695 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92809 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92904 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9298 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/45] | Title | German: | Durch Extrudieren und Formen eines Rohstoffes erzeugtes Blatt | [2008/45] | English: | A sheet obtained by extruding and molding a raw material | [2008/45] | French: | Feuille obtenue par l'extrusion et le moulage d'une matière première | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 14.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01967698.0 / EP1319492 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2226660 (OJI YUKA GOSEISHI KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 21; figures 1-12; claims 1-4,6,7 *; | [A]EP0608918 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 35 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 47 * * page 27, line 22 - page 33, line 29; figures 1,22; claims 1-4 *; | [A]JP2000202903 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-7* abstract * | by applicant | JPH0321135B | JPH04522B | JPH07329147 |