EP2159463 - Conduit lead-through with combination material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/09] | Circuit lead through with combination material | ||
[2010/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG In den Stegwiesen 18 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seibold, Michael, Dr. Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 1 89134 Blaustein / DE | 02 /
Kurz, Ralf Forchenstrasse 14 89537 Giengen / DE | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Szynka, Dirk, et al König, Szynka, Tilmann, von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015020.4 | 26.08.2008 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159463 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159463 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/10, C08J5/12, C09K3/10, H02G3/22 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP);
H02G3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Leitungsdurchführung mit Kombinationswerkstoff | [2010/09] | English: | Conduit lead-through with combination material | [2010/14] | French: | Passage de ligne doté d'une matière première de combinaison | [2010/09] |
Former [2010/09] | Circuit lead through with combination material | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 23.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HR | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | MT | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | NO | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | EE | 13.10.2010 | |
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9609483 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 ** page 13, paragraph 4; figure 10 *; | [X]DE202007002809U (HAUFF TECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |