EP2159208 - Heat insulation body with adhesive agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMAT GmbH Scheifenkamp 16 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krasselt, Volker Christophorusweg 28 40885 Ratingen / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015168.1 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159208 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/68, E04B1/80, F16L59/02 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
C04B41/5089 (EP);
C04B28/24 (EP);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/68 (EP);
E04B1/762 (EP);
C04B2103/56 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/24, C04B14/043, C04B14/18, C04B14/30, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B14/324, C04B14/42, C04B14/46, C04B16/06, C04B18/24, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B38/0054, C04B40/0259 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B28/24 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B38/0054 (EP);
C04B41/5089, C04B41/5092 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Wärmedämmkörper mit Haftvermittler | [2010/09] | English: | Heat insulation body with adhesive agent | [2010/09] | French: | Corps d'isolation thermique doté d'un agent adhésif | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE102007008427 (POREXTHERM DAEMMSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,14-20,23 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0028] * [A] 21,22,24 [Y] 5,7-13; | [DYA]WO0037389 (REDCO NV [BE], et al) [DY] 5,7-13 * claim 1 * * example - * * page 6, paragraph 2 * [A] 1,14-17,21-24 | by applicant | EP1140729 | GB1193172 | EP0231460 |