EP2039527 - Diffractive security system with individualised code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OVD Kinegram AG Zählerweg 12 6301 Zug / CH | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, John, Anthony, Dr. Erlenweg 3B 8804 Au / CH | 02 /
Tompkin, Wayne, Robert, Dr. Oesterliwaldweg 2 5400 Baden / CH | 03 /
Schilling, Andreas, Dr. Flurstrasse 20 6332 Hagendorn (ZG) / CH | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/50] |
Former [2009/13] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015554.2 | 03.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | DE20071044992 | 19.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007044992 | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039527 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039527 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039527 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B42D25/00 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
B42D25/41 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | B42D15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | Diffraktives Sicherheitselement mit individualisiertem Code | [2009/13] | English: | Diffractive security system with individualised code | [2009/13] | French: | Elément de sécurité diffractif doté d'un code individualisé | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2008 | CY | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | IE | 03.09.2015 | LU | 03.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | DK | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 10.12.2014 | |
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 10.12.2014 | |
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5331443 (STANISCI JOSEPH J [US]) [X] 1,2,10-14 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9300224 (LIGHT IMPRESSIONS EUROP LTD [GB]) [A] 15 * abstract * |