EP2161718 - Speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. 1 Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803-4613 / US | [2011/48] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbig, Tobias Traminerweg 40 89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Raab, Martin Am Hochsträss 2 89081 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Brueckner, Raymond Ulmerstrasse 14 89134 Blaustein / DE | 04 /
Gruhn, Rainer Riedlenstrasse 85 89079 Ulm / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015561.7 | 03.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161718 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161718 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06, G10L15/02 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
G10L15/02 (EP,US);
G10L15/142 (EP,US);
G10L15/06 (EP,US);
G10L2015/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/46] |
Former [2010/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spracherkennung | [2010/10] | English: | Speech recognition | [2010/10] | French: | Reconnaissance vocale | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - FERREIRA ANÃBAL, "Static features in real-time recognition of isolated vowels at high pitch", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AIP / ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20071001), vol. 122, no. 4, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 2389 - 2404, XP012102523 [X] 1,10 * sections I.C, II * * figures 5-7 * [A] 2-9,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.2772228 | [XA] - ARSLAN L M ET AL, "Frequency characteristics of foreign accented speech", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-8186-7919-3, pages 1123 - 1126, XP010225996 [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraphs 3, 4 * * figures 2, 3, 5 * [A] 2-9,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596139 | [XA] - MARTIN RAAB ET AL, "Multilingual weighted codebooks", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2008. ICASSP 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080331), ISBN 978-1-4244-1483-3, pages 4257 - 4260, XP031251537 [X] 1,10 * sections 3.1, 3.2, 5.3 * * figure 1 * [A] 8,11 | [XA] - HE ET AL, "Prior knowledge guided maximum expected likelihood based model selection and adaptation for nonnative speech recognition", COMPUTER SPEECH AND LANGUAGE, ELSEVIER, LONDON, GB, (20061112), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0885-2308, pages 247 - 265, XP005726202 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [A] 8,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.csl.2006.06.001 | by applicant | - A. FERREIRA, "a paper entitled Static features in real-time recognition of isolated vowels at high pitch", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (200710), vol. 122, no. 4, pages 2389 - 2404 | - L.M. ARSLAND; J.H.L. HANSEN, "a paper entitled "Frequency characteristics of foreign accented speech", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ICASSP-97, (199704), vol. 2, pages 1123 - 1126 |