EP2033508 - Button type blade brake clutch controls and methods for using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaskawitz, Scott 1944 Conners Ct. Burlington, NC 27215-8056 / US | 02 /
Bender, Brian 2505 Buckhorn Road Mebane, NC 27302-7164 / US | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
Kaskawitz, Scott 1944 Conners Ct. Burlington NC 27215-8056 / US | ||
02 /
Bender, Brian 2505 Buckhorn Road Mebane NC 27302-7164 / US | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015649.0 | 04.09.2008 | [2009/11] | Priority number, date | US20070852720 | 10.09.2007 Original published format: US 852720 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033508 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033508 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/68, A01D34/82 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
A01D34/6812 (EP,US);
A01D2034/6843 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | Kupplungssteuerung für Messerbremse in Knopfform | [2009/48] | English: | Button type blade brake clutch controls and methods for using same | [2009/11] | French: | Contrôles d'embrayage de frein à lames de type bouton et leurs procédés d'utilisation | [2009/11] |
Former [2009/11] | Tastenblattbremsen-Kupplungssteuerungen und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | HR | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | MT | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | PT | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | NO | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IE | 04.09.2010 | LU | 04.09.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/32] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PT | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
LU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
LU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
LU | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.09.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
HR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4413466 (BEUGELSDYK ANTHONY F [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-12 * column 2, line 35 - line 49 * * column 4, line 10 - line 51 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5033595 (PARDEE JAMES A [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 52 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0981945 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 44 - line 47 * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 14 * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1616472 (GARDENA MFG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1702504 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 3-6 * | by applicant | US4413466 |