EP2161026 - Combination of extracts from various plants to improve the symptoms of dementia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/10] | Combination of extracts from various plants to improve the symptoms of mental illnesses | ||
[2012/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kneipp-Werke Kneipp-Mittel-Zentrale GmbH & Co. KG Steinbachtal 43 97082 Würzburg / DE | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Bruno, Dr. Am Grundbach 5 97271 Kleinrinderfeld / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015700.1 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161026 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161026 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/9066, A61K36/258, A61K36/82, A61K36/48, A61P25/28 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/258 (EP,US);
A61K36/82 (EP,US);
A61K36/9066 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/258, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/82, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/9066, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Kombination von Extrakten aus verschiedenen Pflanzen zur Verbesserung der Symptome von Demenzerkrankungen | [2010/10] | English: | Combination of extracts from various plants to improve the symptoms of dementia | [2012/29] | French: | Combinaison d'extraits de différentes plantes pour l'amélioration des symptômes de maladies de démence | [2010/10] |
Former [2010/10] | Combination of extracts from various plants to improve the symptoms of mental illnesses | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | IE | 05.09.2013 | LU | 05.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007057310 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph L; claims 1,2 *; | [X]ZA200303674 (BENEDICT TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS P) [X] 1-16 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2; example -; claim -; table - * | by applicant | DE102005004438 | - BRAMATI ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2003), vol. 51, pages 7472 - 7474 | - SCHULZ ET AL., EUR. FOOD RES. TECHNOL., (2003), vol. 216, pages 539 - 543 |