EP2037405 - Image processing apparatus and method and a computer readable medium having computer executable instructions stored thereon for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Logic, Inc. 11th Floor City Air Tower 159-9 Samseong-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-090 / KR | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Min-Seok 116-2003, Daewoo Prugio Apt., Bongcheon 3-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-053 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young-Hyun 101-903, Ehwa Woosung Apt., Guro 3-dong Guro-gu Seoul 152-053 / KR | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2009/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015855.3 | 09.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | KR20070092540 | 12.09.2007 Original published format: KR 20070092540 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037405 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037405 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/40 (KR);
G06T7/00 (KR);
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
G06V10/267 (EP,US);
G06V40/162 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, PL [2011/08] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Verfahren und computerlesbares Medium mit computerausführbaren Anweisungen darauf zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2009/12] | English: | Image processing apparatus and method and a computer readable medium having computer executable instructions stored thereon for performing the method | [2009/12] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images et procédé, et support lisible sur ordinateur disposant d'instructions exécutables sur ordinateur stockées pour effectuer ce procédé | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6289110 (KIM HYEON-JUNE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14,21 * abstract * * column 2 - column 5 * * figures 1-9 *; | [XY]US6546185 (KIM HYEON JUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,11,12,14-17,21 * abstract * * column 3 - column 7 * * figures 1-12 * [Y] 8-10,18-20; | [XYI] - KENJI SUZUKI, ISAO HORIBA,NOBORU SUGIE, "Linear-time connected-component labeling based on sequential local operations", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, (20030221), vol. 89, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1077-3142(02)00030-9, pages 1 - 23, XP002578314 [X] 1,2,11,12,21 * abstract * * sections 1-3 * [Y] 8-10,18-20 [I] 3,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1077-3142(02)00030-9 | | [A] - HWEI-JEN LIN ET AL, "Face Detection Based on Skin Color Segmentation and Neural Network", NEURAL NETWORKS AND BRAIN, 2005. ICNN&B '05. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 13-15 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICNNB.2005.1614818, (20051013), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-9422-3, pages 1144 - 1149, XP010906384 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNNB.2005.1614818 | Examination | - I. Pitas, Digital Image Processing Algorithms And Applications (Section 6.5), Canada, John Wiley &Sons, INC., (20000301), ISBN 0-471-37739-2 | by applicant | US6289110 | US6546185 | - KENJI ET AL., LINEAR-TIME CONNECTED-COMPONENT LABELING BASED ON SEQUENTIAL LOCAL OPERATIONS, (20030221), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 1 - 23 |