EP2042376 - Safety device for a vehicle interior [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOS GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Heinkel-Strasse 2 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renz, Günther Erich-Kästner-Strasse 48/1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015896.7 | 10.09.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | DE20071047758 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007047758 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042376 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04, B60R21/06 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B60R5/047 (EP,US);
B60R21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/50] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für einen Fahrzeuginnenraum | [2009/14] | English: | Safety device for a vehicle interior | [2009/14] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour un habitacle de véhicule | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006053520 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 8, line 6 - page 14, line 7; figures 1-14 *; | [X]DE102005048207 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1816032 (BOS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021]; figure 2 * |