EP2037445 - Display apparatus including wireless communication device and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2012/45] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Bum-Jin 105-2202, 525-1 Daewoo 1-cha Apt. Dujeong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung-Je 102-504, Park Town Daerim APT. Sunae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Pyoun, Seoung-Bum 111-1503, Cham E-Seul APT. Hapjeong-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Woo-Il 116-2001, Donga Sollecity APT. Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Dae-Seop No. 151-1803, Hwanggol Maeul 1-danji APT. Youngtong 1-dong Youngtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016037.7 | 11.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | KR20070092714 | 12.09.2007 Original published format: KR 20070092714 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037445 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037445 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/36 (KR);
G09G5/18 (EP,US);
H04B1/10 (KR);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04B15/02 (EP,US);
G09G2310/08 (EP,US);
G09G2330/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2011/09] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung mit drahtloser Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2009/12] | English: | Display apparatus including wireless communication device and method of operating the same | [2009/12] | French: | Appareil d'affichage incluant un dispositif de communication sans fil et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 23.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2006166622 (USUI HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,16,18,22-24 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 3,7 * [A] 4,14,15,25 [I] 9,10,20,21; | [XI]US2003198307 (NEILL TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11-13,16-19,22-24 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 3,5 * [I] 9,10,20,21; | [XAI]JP2006237718 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6,11-13,16,22-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 4,14,15,25 [I] 7-10,17-21 |