EP2163479 - Supply and method for operating a supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhlmann Pac-Systeme GmbH & Co. KG Uhlmannstrasse 14-18 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krahl, Wolfgang Pfeifferstrasse 31 88471 Laupheim / DE | 02 /
Gnann, Kurt Wielandstrasse 9/2 88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
Zuleger, Martin Schlossäcker 18 88480 Achstetten / DE | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016160.7 | 13.09.2008 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163479 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2163479 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/06, B65B35/34, // B65B9/04 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
B65B35/06 (EP);
B65B35/34 (EP);
B65B39/007 (EP);
B65B9/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IE, IT [2010/46] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zuführung und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Zuführung | [2010/11] | English: | Supply and method for operating a supply | [2010/11] | French: | Alimentation et procédé de fonctionnement d'une alimentation | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 17.11.2010 | [2011/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE29919756U (ELECTRO MEC READING LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0142088 (IMA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 10, lines 8-15; figures 1,3,6 *; | [Y]US2005000192 (AYLWARD JOHN T [US]) [Y] 5,13,14 * paragraph [0033]; figure 6 *; | [A]FR2759669 (EPMO [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 6, lines 12-22; figures 1,2,3A-3D *; | [A]US2210086 (MARTIN LEAKE HUGH) [A] 1,9 * column 4, lines 20-33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1923311 (UHLMANN PAC SYSTEME GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0009]; figure 3 * |