EP2019565 - Optimizing receipt of call/broadcast paging messages by self-powered wireless communications devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/05] | Method and apparatus optimizing receipt of call/broadcast paging messages by self-powered wireless communications devices | ||
[2017/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parvathanathan, Subrahmanya c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/43] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Parvathanathan, Subrahmanya c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2009/05] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016211.8 | 11.01.2005 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | US20040756160 | 12.01.2004 Original published format: US 756160 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019565 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019565 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
H03M7/30 (KR);
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optimierung der Empfangsbestätigung von Telefon- und Funkrufnachrichten durch drahtlose Kommunikationsvorrichtungen mit eigener Stromquelle | [2017/17] | English: | Optimizing receipt of call/broadcast paging messages by self-powered wireless communications devices | [2017/17] | French: | Optimiser la réception de messages d'appels/diffusion par des dispositifs de communications sans fil autoalimentés | [2017/17] |
Former [2009/05] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Optimierung der Empfangsbestätigung von Telefon- und Funkrufnachrichten durch drahtlose Kommunikationsvorrichtungen mit eigener Stromquelle | ||
Former [2009/05] | Method and apparatus optimizing receipt of call/broadcast paging messages by self-powered wireless communications devices | ||
Former [2009/05] | Procédé et appareil pour optimiser la réception de messages d'appels/diffusion par des dispositifs de communications sans fil autoalimentés | Examination procedure | 24.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05705466.0 / EP1714520 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050705466) is 29.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2005 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | IE | 11.01.2018 | LU | 11.01.2018 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5870673 (HAARTSEN JACOBUS CORNELIS [SE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 7 * * column 10, line 1 - column 11, line 12 ** figure 5 *; | [X]US6157815 (COLLINS DAVID NOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 27 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 21 * * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 65 * |