EP2047946 - Milling and drilling machine with palette exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECKEL MAHO Pfronten GmbH Deckel-Maho-Strasse 1 87459 Pfronten / DE | [2011/29] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states DECKEL MAHO Pfronten GmbH DECKEL MAHO-Strasse 1 87459 Pfronten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Robert Margeritenweg 8 87459 Pfronten / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Erny, Tobias Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Erny, Tobias Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016694.5 | 23.09.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | DE20072014117U | 09.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007014117 U | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047946 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047946 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/48, B23Q1/66 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
B23Q1/66 (EP,US);
B23Q1/4876 (EP,US);
B23Q7/1431 (EP);
Y10S29/056 (EP,US);
Y10S29/094 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fräs- und Bohrmaschine mit Palettenwechsler | [2009/16] | English: | Milling and drilling machine with palette exchanger | [2009/16] | French: | Machine de fraisage et de forage dotée d'un dispositif d'échange de palettes | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 16.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19853945 (HECKERT WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 * |