EP2169146 - Information panel for excavation structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kriehme, Andreas Neustadt 61 8200 Schaffenhausen / DE | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Knoop, Philipp, et al VKK Patentanwälte Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Knoop, Philipp, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016731.5 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169146 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04H13/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
E04H13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Informationsstafel für Grabbauwerke | [2010/13] | English: | Information panel for excavation structures | [2010/13] | French: | Tableau d'information pour tombeaux | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1860915 (WHITMAN RILEY H) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 31; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5822895 (RISDAL BRUCE D [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,2,3a,3b *; | [X]US2010246 (SLAWSON MARION G) [X] 1,4-9 * page 1, column L, line 47 - column R, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US1425361 (VICTOR BEROUD) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE4028247 (WINKLER MORITZ [CH]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4028237 | DE202004001584U | DE202008001892U |